Trustees ST CHAD'S COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1085793
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Venerable Bob Vooper Chair 01 April 2020
None on record
Ian Stevenson Trustee 14 June 2022
None on record
Judith Wood Archer Trustee 02 November 2021
None on record
Stuart Angus Trustee 24 September 2019
None on record
Helen Jones Trustee 01 July 2017
None on record
John Adams Trustee 01 July 2014
KEELMAN HOMES LIMITED
Received: On time
LESYA BOURN Trustee 29 November 2012
None on record
VALERIE BARRON Trustee 29 November 2012
None on record