ONE HEART MINISTRIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activity is to support the pastors of neglected churches (primarily in the countries of Eastern Europe) by teaching, ministry and fianancial support and thus to see a growth in maturity and effectiveness. The teaching is provided online in addition to visiting the churches to hold seminars. We also aim to partner with churches in humanitarian projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Calderdale
- Albania
- Macedonia
- Malaysia
- Moldova
- Poland
- Ukraine
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 13 January 2001: Standard registration
- 29 June 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- 29 June 2023: Funds transferred to 1161494 NORTHERN LIGHTS CHURCH
- RADOST (Working name)
- RADOST-GEZIM (Working name)
- RADOST MISSION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.55k | £11.30k | £5.06k | £3.81k | £12.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.13k | £11.61k | £5.12k | £3.98k | £11.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 11 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23RD JULY 2000 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED ON 22 SEPTEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH,THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION,THE RELIEF OF POVERTY,SICKNESS OR HARDSHIP AND OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window