FRIENDS OF BUCKNALL SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE HELP RAISE FUNDS FOR BUCKNALL SCHOOL
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 05 October 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JILLIAN WAGNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAULA WILKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.21k | £1.58k | £1.55k | £557 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £995 | £2.59k | £721 | £1.66k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 307 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 307 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 673 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 673 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1038 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1038 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 March 2022 | 271 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 March 2022 | 636 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JUNE 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY I) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; II) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
BUCKNALL SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Campney Grange Cottages
Campney Lane
Bucknall
Woodhall Spa
LN10 5DX
- Phone:
- 07939309216
- Email:
- school@bucknall.lincs.sch.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window