THE COTSWOLD MALE VOICE CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The choir practice, promote and study music in order to foster public knowledge and appreciation of music by means of public performance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
- South Gloucestershire
- Warwickshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 20 April 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROY HEMMING | Chair | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Cooper | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Southey | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MCDONNELL | Trustee | 22 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.07k | £10.44k | £27.84k | £27.53k | £31.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.14k | £8.20k | £27.65k | £28.23k | £26.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 12 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 12 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 APRIL 1996 AS AMENDED 13 MARCH 2001, 21 MARCH 2007 AND 21 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
TO PRACTICE, PROMOTE AND STUDY MUSIC IN ORDER TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Bluebell Road
Walton Cardiff
TEWKESBURY
Gloucestershire
GL20 7FE
- Phone:
- 07710130579
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window