TRINITY HELPERS

Charity number: 1090112
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 04/04/2016 04/04/2017 04/04/2018 04/04/2019 04/04/2020
Total gross income £1.54k £1.37k £2.13k £2.05k £2.15k
Total expenditure £2.89k £2.13k £909 £1.94k £2.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A