Accounts and annual returns BOOST FELIXSTOWE LTD

Charity number: 1083875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 03 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 03 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 22 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 20 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 02 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 02 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 15 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 15 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window