BEDDINGTON EVENING TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD

Charity number: 1083127
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £4.36k £4.36k £4.00k £3.16k £2.82k
Total expenditure £3.59k £3.59k £3.83k £3.05k £3.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A