THE PASTURES & OTHER BLAKENEY LAND CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1083592
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 December 2020 312 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 02 March 2017 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required