THE PASTURES & OTHER BLAKENEY LAND CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1083592
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £820 £40 £12.00k £12.00k £500
Total expenditure £1.89k £2.88k £0 £3.66k £4.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £12.00k N/A N/A