Trustees EAST ANGLIAN AIR AMBULANCE

Charity number: 1083876
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alastair Walter Wilson Trustee 15 December 2020
None on record
Elizabeth Sarah Evans Trustee 17 December 2019
None on record
THOMAS FRANEY WELLS Trustee 21 September 2017
SYDNEY HOWARD LOVELL MEMORIAL ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
Roger Steven Holden Trustee 13 December 2016
None on record
NIGEL SAVORY FCA DL Trustee 17 September 2015
NORFOLK RIVERS TRUST
Received: On time
MUSIC IN COUNTRY CHURCHES
Received: On time
Major General Sir William Cubitt KCVO, CBE Trustee 22 June 2015
None on record
Duncan Astill Trustee 11 September 2014
None on record
STEPHANIE BOURNE Trustee
None on record