ST MARY COMMUNITY HALLS COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1087633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 24 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 16 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 16 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 16 May 2017 On time Download