THE PRIESTLY FRATERNITY OF ST PETER

Charity number: 1083419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 12 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 12 January 2022 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 23 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 23 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 24 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 24 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 01 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 01 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 22 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required