1ST THORPE ST ANDREW (24TH NORWICH) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1082964
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 16 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required