1ST THORPE ST ANDREW (24TH NORWICH) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1082964
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £7.44k £11.57k £8.00k £9.10k £195.47k
Total expenditure £6.13k £10.80k £9.44k £9.73k £27.50k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A