Accounts and annual returns ZAWIYA TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1090548
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 07 August 2022 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 07 August 2022 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 01 August 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 30 September 2020 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 30 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 31 July 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required