Financial history ZAWIYA TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1090548
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £7.11k £14.31k £8.22k £21.90k £60.59k
Total expenditure £15.32k £9.27k £8.18k £12.74k £18.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k N/A