BRITISH DALMATIAN WELFARE

Charity number: 1086519
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £56.29k £108.95k £49.69k £52.56k £72.35k
Total expenditure £41.36k £34.78k £44.09k £50.40k £69.45k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A