PHILANTHROPY IMPACT

Charity number: 1089157
Charity reporting is overdue by 79 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 79 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 79 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 25 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 25 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 30 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 30 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 30 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 30 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 24 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 24 July 2017 On time Download