PHILANTHROPY IMPACT

Charity number: 1089157
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £170.68k £151.36k £151.36k £158.93k £213.95k
Total expenditure £174.79k £159.57k £159.57k £160.44k £211.20k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A