THE MULTI-FAITH CENTRE AT THE UNIVERSITY OF DERBY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of dialogue and understanding between members of different faith communities, within the City of Derby, Derbyshire, the East Midlands and generally within the United Kingdom.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £151,349 from 3 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 June 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Freestone | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Heather Kinuthia | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eve Sacker | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Irshad Baqui | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Jo Bishton | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ejaz Sawar | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
The Rt Revd Libby Lane | Trustee | 02 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hardial Singh Dhillon | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andy Oakley | Trustee | 13 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ali Poostchi | Trustee | 26 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £205.33k | £202.95k | £123.41k | £213.61k | £277.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £198.61k | £161.86k | £137.12k | £199.60k | £253.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £59.97k | N/A | N/A | £46.23k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | £46.23k | £151.35k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 AUGUST 2000 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION S DATED 18 MAY 2001 AND 4 MARCH 2010 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION 23 NOVEMBER 2005 as amended on 05 Oct 2020 as amended on 07 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
1) TO PROVIDE EDUCATION IN AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT FAITHS AND RELIGIONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY WHATEVER MEANS THE TRUSTEES MAY THINK FIT INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION THE PROVISION OF A MULTI-FAITH CENTRE AND TO PROMOTE AND PUBLICISE ACTIVITIES TO ENCOURAGE MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN MEMBERS OF DIFFERENT RELIGIONS OR FAITH TRADITIONS AND THEIR INTERACTIONS BOTH WITH ONE ANOTHER AND WITH THE WIDER SOCIETY 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS BY THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS 3) TO USE THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN MAINTAINING THE MULTI-FAITH CENTRE INCLUDING THE FABRIC OF THE BUILDINGS AND THE CONTENTS OF THE MULTI-FAITH CENTRE INCLUDING THE FABRIC OF THE BUILDINGS AND THE CONTENTS OF THE MULTI-FAITH CENTRE AND THE MAINTENANCE OF RELIGIOUS SERVICES IN THE PLACES OF WORSHIP WITHIN THE MULTI-FAITH CENTRE AND OTHER ACTIVITIES 4) TO PROVIDE OR AUGMENT THE STIPEND OF ANY MINISTER OR ASSIST THE MINISTER IN MEETING THE EXPENSES INCURRED IN THE PERFORMANCE OF HIS OR HER DUTIES AND TO PROVIDE OR AUGMENT OR ASSIST WITH FINANCIAL COSTS OR EXPENSES FOR ANY RELIGIOUS ADVISORS OR CHAPLAINS PRACTISING HIS OR HER FAITH OR PROVIDING RELIGIOUS EDUCATION AT THE MULTI-FAITH CENTRE 5) SUCH OTHER OBJECTS AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Area of benefit
NO DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIVERSITY OF DERBY
KEDLESTON ROAD
DERBY
DE22 1GB
- Phone:
- 01332 593513
- Email:
- mfc@derby.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window