Accounts and annual returns ST PATRICK'S COLLEGE JAFFNA ALUMNI ASSOCIATION UK

Charity number: 1088167
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 21 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 21 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 28 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 28 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 30 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 30 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2018 26 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 26 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2017 28 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 28 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window