ALULBAYT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1085713
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £914.64k £306.13k £626.36k £251.10k £298.09k
Total expenditure £488.85k £476.91k £441.14k £380.84k £309.33k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £914.64k N/A £528.20k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A £98.16k N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £488.85k N/A £441.14k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £3.49k N/A £2.58k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A