THE FRIENDS OF OAKFIELD PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SCHOOL FUND RAISING EVENTS EG. SUMMER FAYRE, CHRISTMAS BAZAAR AND ADHOC EVENTS DURING ACADEMIC YEAR
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Essex
Governance
- 22 December 2000: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF OAKFIELD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jenna Genge | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Carla Fitzgerald | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Dowds | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jodie Cameron | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Cheddad | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Gower | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Peters | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cara O'Keeffe | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Leigh Waterhouse | Trustee | 06 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.30k | £11.35k | £37.78k | £33.46k | £35.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.40k | £10.56k | £41.06k | £28.85k | £23.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 20 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Accounts not yet received | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 SEPTEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS;
Area of benefit
OAKFIELD PRIMARY SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oakfield Primary School
Scott Drive
WICKFORD
SS12 9PW
- Phone:
- 01268734343
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window