Accounts and annual returns THE IBADAN MEDICAL SPECIALISTS GROUP

Charity number: 1090030
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 20 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 17 September 2021 224 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 17 September 2021 224 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 19 May 2020 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 05 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 05 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required