Financial history THE IBADAN MEDICAL SPECIALISTS GROUP

Charity number: 1090030
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £8.52k £21.68k £6.08k £25.13k £9.60k
Total expenditure £9.26k £11.20k £3.14k £14.87k £3.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A