Accounts and annual returns YORK RACIAL EQUALITY NETWORK

Charity number: 1084619
Charity reporting is overdue by 390 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 25 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 25 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 390 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 390 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 13 February 2020 13 days late Download Open in new window