FRIENDS OF MANDING CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to assist in the provision of a medical centre in the upper river division of The Gambia
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- The Gambia
Governance
- 21 August 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH ROBINSON | Chair |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1192 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1192 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1557 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1557 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23RD MAY 2001
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL, AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER TO, OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF, SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE FOREGOING 1. TO RELIEVE PATIENTS RECEIVING TREATMENT AT THE MANDING HOSPITAL GAMBIA OR ON THEIR DISCHARGE WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. 2. TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE PUBLIC HEALTH AND RELIEVE SICKNESS BY FURTHERING THE EDUCATION OF MEDICAL AND NURSING STUDENTS IN THE GAMBIA. 3. TO APPLY THE TRUST FUND FOR THE RELIEF OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE GAMBIA WHO ARE SUFFERING HARDSHIP AS A RESULT OF DROUGHT EARTHQUAKE FLOOD OR OTHER NATURAL DISASTER OR WHO BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CONDITIONS ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE (THE TRUSTEES MAY GRANT RELIEF TO SUCH INHABITANTS THROUGH THE AGENCY OF OTHER CHARITIES).
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
82 FINCHINGFIELD WAY
COLCHESTER
CO2 0AU
- Phone:
- 07726788554
- Email:
- keith@krxheaton.co.uk
- Website:
-
beehive.thisissessex/friendsofmanding
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window