Accounts and annual returns STANLEY HOUSE ACADEMY

Charity number: 1088514
Charity reporting is overdue by 537 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 172 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 172 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 March 2023 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 537 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 April 2022 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 June 2021 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 July 2020 165 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required