Financial history UK FRIENDS OF THE ASSOCIATION FOR THE WELLBEING OF ISRAEL'S SOLDIERS

Charity number: 1084272
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.04m £810.50k £739.22k £357.02k £262.24k
Total expenditure £1.03m £925.07k £767.75k £350.53k £296.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £8.08k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.04m £810.50k £739.12k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £105 £0 £98 N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £20.00k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £731.18k £609.88k £499.45k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £293.92k £315.19k £268.31k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £54.49k £56.25k £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £483.36k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A