UK FRIENDS OF THE ASSOCIATION FOR THE WELLBEING OF ISRAEL'S SOLDIERS

Charity number: 1084272
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The principal objects of the charity are: 1) The relief of need and suffering of serving and discharged Israeli soldiers and their families 2) The advancement of education of serving and discharged Israeli soldiers 3) to provide or assist in the provision of facilities for recreation or other leisure time occupation in the interests of social welfare.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Israel

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 December 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • UK FRIENDS OF AWIS (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
COLONEL RICHARD KEMP Trustee 09 January 2018
None on record
Joshua Swidler Trustee 14 December 2016
None on record
ZEEV REMEZ Trustee
None on record
PETER SUSSMAN Trustee
E W JOSEPH CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: 2 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £810.50k £739.22k £357.02k £262.24k £727.44k
Total expenditure £925.07k £767.75k £350.53k £296.39k £501.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £8.08k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £810.50k £739.12k N/A N/A £727.44k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £0 £98 N/A N/A £0
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 £20.00k N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £609.88k £499.45k N/A N/A £315.54k
Expenditure - Raising funds £315.19k £268.31k N/A N/A £186.00k
Expenditure - Governance £56.25k £0 N/A N/A £23.18k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £483.36k N/A N/A £292.36k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Own use assets £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Long-term investments £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Other assets £508.21k £479.02k N/A N/A £682.63k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities £18.52k £17.86k N/A N/A £16.02k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 February 2024 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 09 February 2024 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1st Floor Sackville House
143-149 Fenchurch Street
London
EC3M 6BL
Phone:
02032103060