THE INTERNATIONAL GOLF CHARITY

Charity number: 1085994
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 December 2020 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 10 December 2020 40 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 November 2018 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 02 November 2018 2 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 28 September 2017 On time Download