THE INTERNATIONAL GOLF CHARITY

Charity number: 1085994
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Timothy Regan Trustee 29 December 2017 None on record
Nicholas John Pyle OBE Trustee 26 May 2015 None on record
FRED BICKMORE Trustee 15 September 2016 None on record
BRIGADIER JOHN SMEDLEY CVO Chair
JOHN COLLINS Received: On time
CHRISTOPHER JOHN DAHL Trustee 25 February 2017 None on record
LT COLONEL SEAN O'DWYER CVO DL Trustee 22 March 2001 None on record
Craig Andrew LVO Trustee 29 December 2017 None on record
PETER VENISON Trustee 29 December 2000 None on record
Commodore Michael John Delane Walliker Trustee 17 September 2020
THE PEWTERERS' SEAHORSE CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Captain Andrew Mark Aspden RN Trustee 27 March 2019 None on record