Trustees ST MARTIN'S CENTRE PROJECT

Charity number: 1088872
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEVE DAVENPORT Chair 15 February 2013
None on record
HELEN WILLIAMS Trustee 02 September 2021
None on record
LESLEY ANNE ROBERTS Trustee 02 September 2021
None on record
DAVID ONIONS Trustee 07 January 2019
None on record
Judith Clare Williams Trustee 19 June 2018
None on record
Heather Lloyd Trustee 05 January 2018
None on record
Keith Allum Trustee 06 March 2014
None on record
DUNCAN LAING Trustee
None on record
SUSAN HEARD Trustee
None on record