Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST THOMAS A BECKET TILSHEAD

Charity number: 1083561
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 19 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 17 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required