ST FAITH'S MISSION

Charity number: 1096597
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 January 2020 356 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 13 September 2017 225 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required