LONDON MIDDLE EAST INSTITUTE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education and research in all or any aspects of the Arab Middle East and North Africa, Israel, Iran and Turkey and to secure the publication of any such research, for the benefit of the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- THE MIDDLE EAST INSTITUTE IN LONDON (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £324.85k | £328.13k | £0 | £54 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £323.23k | £345.53k | £285 | £241 | £241 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/05/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/11/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/06/2015 AS AMENDED ON 31 MAR 2022 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 29 MAR 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN ALL OR ANY ASPECTS OF THE ARAB MIDDLE EAST AND NORTH AFRICA, ISRAEL, IRAN, AND TURKEY (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE REGION', WHICH EXPRESSION SHALL INCLUDE ANY PART OF THE REGION), AND TO SECURE THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window