CITIZENS ADVICE CAERPHILLY BLAENAU GWENT

Charity number: 1084045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 10 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 14 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 17 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 08 November 2016 On time Download