CITIZENS ADVICE CAERPHILLY BLAENAU GWENT

Charity number: 1084045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GORDON PANKHURST Trustee
NEWPORT CAB Received: On time
MR TUDOR DAVIES Trustee
DISABILITY CAN DO
MOSTYN WILFRED DAVIES Trustee None on record
Janet Channing Trustee 06 December 2018 None on record
COLIN MANN Trustee 09 January 2013
GROUNDWORK CAERPHILLY Received: On time
Julia Rose Trustee 15 January 2014 None on record
JACQUELINE DIX Trustee 08 February 2018 None on record
Glyn Jones Trustee 15 January 2014 None on record
STEVEN JOHN SKIVENS Trustee None on record
Lili Thompson Trustee 17 September 2020 None on record