SOTTERLEY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1084642
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 October 2020 31 August 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 October 2019 14 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 October 2018 17 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 October 2017 11 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 October 2016 11 March 2018 193 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2016 Not Required