SOTTERLEY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1084642
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/10/2016 30/10/2017 30/10/2018 30/10/2019 30/10/2020
Total gross income £4.74k £688 £754 £5.77k £770
Total expenditure £0 £60 £60 £25 £60
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A