FIVE ASHES VILLAGE HALL AND MEMORIAL PLAYING FIELD TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support the village hall and playing field for the local and wider community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Total income includes £7,039 from 3 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.71k | £26.64k | £27.32k | £32.23k | £34.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.59k | £13.82k | £14.91k | £10.07k | £15.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £500 | £11.83k | £17.08k | £7.04k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 15TH SEPTEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF FIVE ASHES, IN THE PARISH OF MAYFIELD, IN THE COUNTY OF EAST SUSSEX WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF: (A) A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (1) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (11) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION; AND (B) A RECREATION GROUND FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE VILLAGE OF FIVE ASHES, IN THE PARISH OF MAYFIELD, EAST SUSSEX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window