THE JUBILEE MASTERS LODGE CENTENARY TRUST

Charity number: 1090364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £778 £581 £933 £1.71k £1.25k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £100.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A