CHEMIN NEUF COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
activities for the advancement of the religious and other charitable work of the Community e.g. individual or couple retreats, language programmes, support of 'Street Children Project' in the DRC.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
- Lambeth
- West Sussex
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
Governance
- 16 January 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marc Najjar | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Charles Adrian Hadley | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jean Alain Marie Joseph Poujol | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sister Joanna Ewa Sikorska | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|||||
FATHER ANTOINE PAUL JACQUES MARIE COUSIN | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alan Ian Morley-Fletcher | Trustee | 30 September 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £408.17k | £303.04k | £272.18k | £321.24k | £311.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £385.10k | £207.07k | £310.73k | £330.66k | £332.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 November 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 November 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 NOVEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CONGREGATION AS THE TRUSTEES WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE SUPERIOR SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND IF AT ANY TIME THE CONGREGATION CEASE TO EXIST OR SHALL CEASE TO CARRY ON RELIGIOUS OR OTHER CHARITABLE WORK THEN FOR SUCH OTHER LAWFUL CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
OUR LADY OF ENGLAND PRIORY
SCHOOL LANE
STORRINGTON
PULBOROUGH
RH20 4LN
- Phone:
- 01903742150
- Email:
- storrington@chemin-neuf.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window