THE COMMUNITY SUPPORT NETWORK, SOUTH LONDON

Charity number: 1083649
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Community Support Network South London (CSN) provides mental health advocacy services for clients in forensic (ie., those who have committed criminal offences and have mental health problems), in-patient and community settings.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £207,177
Total expenditure: £215,021

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Croydon
  • Lambeth
  • Lewisham
  • Southwark

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 November 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • COMMUNITY SUPPORT NETWORK (Working name)
  • CSN (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Shani Minogue Trustee 07 January 2025
None on record
Scott Dawson Trustee 22 October 2024
None on record
Primrose Ante-Bennett Trustee 22 October 2024
None on record
Amelia Fiorillo Trustee 22 October 2024
None on record
Charlie Reynolds Trustee 22 October 2024
None on record
Augustine Isichei Trustee 14 November 2023
None on record
Rascelles Mundle Trustee 09 November 2021
None on record
Clementina Avwenayeri Okorefe Trustee 11 September 2019
None on record
Abdul Rahman Tanko Trustee 06 March 2019
None on record
John Adapoe Trustee 06 March 2019
None on record
Manjula Roy Trustee 15 March 2017
None on record
Andrew Lennon Trustee 20 February 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £240.28k £217.33k £233.15k £212.03k £207.18k
Total expenditure £255.35k £274.44k £214.49k £252.38k £215.02k
Income from government contracts N/A £167.06k £167.06k £167.06k £167.06k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 15 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Community Support Network South London
336 Brixton Road
LONDON
SW9 7AA
Phone:
0207 274 4490