Accounts and annual returns THE CLAY CROSS TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD

Charity number: 1084489
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 03 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 29 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 01 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 16 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 12 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required