Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF MENDIP HOSPITAL CEMETERY

Charity number: 1085981
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 17 January 2022 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 21 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 22 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 16 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 06 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required