REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD

Charity number: 1084767
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.76m £4.89m £4.31m £4.10m £3.69m
Total expenditure £4.24m £5.79m £5.22m £3.86m £3.45m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £183.92k
Income - Donations and legacies £4.30m £4.43m £3.83m £3.60m £3.60m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £5.53k £282
Income - Charitable activities £430.46k £437.35k £449.90k £460.64k £74.50k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £31.98k £18.90k £27.95k £36.30k £12.84k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.24m £5.79m £5.22m £3.85m £3.45m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £84.14k £133.48k £119.41k £0 £87.73k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £14.54k £1.32k