Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF MILBORNE ST ANDREW FIRST SCHOOL

Charity number: 1084154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 05 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 18 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 01 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 08 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 19 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required