Financial history FRIENDS OF MILBORNE ST ANDREW FIRST SCHOOL

Charity number: 1084154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £2.45k £5.57k £3.32k £4.98k £4.67k
Total expenditure £1.94k £1.92k £8.65k £1.51k £2.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A