Financial history THE CHEAM VILLAGE 'A' TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD

Charity number: 1084120
Charity reporting is overdue by 171 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £5.11k £6.35k £6.87k £5.49k £4.67k
Total expenditure £4.94k £6.46k £6.35k £5.87k £5.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A